+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 232
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/15/2019
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 15, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
April 9, 2019: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor