+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 938
- Effective date(s) 05/19/2014
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. concurred in H. am. 2
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 cal. for 4/16/2014
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1094)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1211)
- Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0
- Motion to lift from table the motion to reconsider actions adopted.
- Motion to reconsider actions adopted.
- Am. no. 2 reconsidered.
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA1211)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0910)
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/2/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0910
Amendment 1-0 to SB1128
+ − Votes (5)
April 16, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2
- Yeas: 29
April 15, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
April 15, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
April 2, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 32
March 25, 2014: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor