+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/18/2017
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2017
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2017
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/7/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 3, 2018: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor