+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
- Pub. Ch. 104
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0045)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0043)
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/9/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 25, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
March 18, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
March 9, 2021: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
White
Type:
Primary Sponsor