+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 04/30/2015
- Pub. Ch. 380
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0365)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 1, PNV 1
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0263)
- Passed H., Ayes 74, Nays 20, PNV 1
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2015
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2015
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to last calendar
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 13, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 1
April 13, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2015: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
April 7, 2015: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor