+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 416
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/17/2019
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/17/2019
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/16/2019
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/10/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/9/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/2/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 17, 2019: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2