+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 58
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2015
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/2/2015
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/25/2015
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 2/25/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/18/2015
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Education Committee
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments.
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 9
February 25, 2015: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 25, 2015: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor