+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - SA0295)
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0183)
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0182)
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/28/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Gov. Comm. to 3/19/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/12/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/19/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
March 28, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: Rule 39(3) AMEND# 3 BY Kyle
- Yeas: 30
March 28, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 31
March 19, 2013: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 9