+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 233
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/15/2019
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/10/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/3/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/3/2019
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/27/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/20/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (5)
April 15, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
April 10, 2019: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
April 30, 2009: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 9, 2009: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 9
March 31, 2009: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm.
- Yeas: 9