+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Failed In S. S&L Govt. Comm. Ayes 2, Nays 7 PNV 0
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 1/21/2014
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Gov. Comm.
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to final cal.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
January 21, 2014: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 7