+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2016
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2016
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2016
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 30, 2016: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor