+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/18/2013
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. F,W&M Comm. to 4/18/2013
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/17/2013
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/17/2013
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/16/2013
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/16/2013
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/15/2013
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/9/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0437
Amendment 1-0 to SB1074
+ − Vote
April 9, 2013: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor