+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/9/2013
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/9/2013
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/2/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0436
Amendment 1-0 to SB1067
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor