+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 261
- Effective date(s) 05/02/2017
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0203)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0321)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2017
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/5/2017
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/5/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2017
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/4/2017
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2017
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 20, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 87
April 17, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 8
April 5, 2017: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
April 5, 2017: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor