+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 126
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 67, Nays 16, PNV 4
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 25, Nays 4, PNV 1
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 28, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 4
March 21, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2019: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor