+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 341
- Effective date(s) 05/04/2015
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 2, PNV 1
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0249)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0236)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 3, PNV 1
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/2/2015
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2015
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/30/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/24/2015
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/24/2015
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2015
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments.
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 20, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 2, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
March 30, 2015: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
March 30, 2015: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor