+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 918
- Effective date(s) 05/19/2014; 07/01/2014
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0908)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0990)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0778)
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 21, Nays 9
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/31/2014
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/17/2014
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. H&W Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 0
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2014
- Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 3/12/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 3/5/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 2/19/2014
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 16, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88
March 31, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
March 17, 2014: S. H&W COMM.
- Yeas: 7
March 12, 2014: S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor