+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 7, 2015: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 5
April 7, 2015: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor