+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 293
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2021
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/6/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor change.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Vote
April 6, 2021: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor