+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/18/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2015: SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 18, 2015: SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor