+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 85
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/21/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/6/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 6, 2013: S. ED. COMM.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1