+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 251
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2015
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/13/2015
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/9/2015
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/1/2015
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/1/2015
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/25/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2015: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
April 1, 2015: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8