+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2013
- Pub. Ch. 418
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- S. concurred in H. am. 2
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/18/2013
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 77, Nays 18
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0443)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0186)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0054)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 27, Nays 3
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/7/2013
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- S. Reset on Cal. for 3/7/2013
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/4/2013
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- S. Placed on cal. for 3/4/2013
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/26/2013
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/26/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/19/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0054
Amendment 1-0 to SB1015
+ − Votes (4)
April 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 5
April 16, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 18
March 7, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
February 26, 2013: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor