+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 296
- Pub. Ch. 296
- Effective date(s) 04/29/2013
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0099)
- Passed H., Ayes 85, Nays 11
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0080)
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/28/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0080
Amendment 1-0 to SB1003
+ − Votes (3)
April 15, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 11
March 28, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 32
March 19, 2013: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor