+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 71
- Effective date(s) 03/31/2017
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/13/2017
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/8/2017
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
February 13, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 8
February 8, 2017: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor