+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
- Pub. Ch. 1
On March 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On February 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 77, Nays 16, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0002)
- Am. tabled. (Amendment 5 - HA0028)
- Am. tabled. (Amendment 4 - HA0027)
- Am. tabled. (Amendment 3 - HA0025)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0012)
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0008)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0003)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0015)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 6
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/13/2023
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
On February 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/7/2023
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/1/2023
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
On January 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On November 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On November 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On November 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On November 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (7)
February 23, 2023: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY MITCHELL PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 41
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2023: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY HULSEY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 41
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2023: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 41
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2023: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 41
- Present/NV: 1
February 13, 2023: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
February 7, 2023: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
February 1, 2023: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (59)
Type:
Primary Sponsor