+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/2/2018
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3-26-18
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
April 2, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
March 26, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 98
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor