+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/16/2020
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/9/20
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 28
March 9, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor