+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/14/2014
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 97, Nays 0
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/09/14
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
April 14, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 30
April 9, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 97
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor