+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/21/2015
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/20/2015
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2015
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for concurrence, with am., by Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/8/2015
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/8/2015
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/7/2015
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/7/2015
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/1/2015
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means until 4/1/2015
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/31/2015
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Adopted, Ayes 86, Nays 3
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/3/2015
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., ref. to Transportation Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 8, 2015: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
April 8, 2015: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
March 16, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 16, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
March 16, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 16, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 3, 2015: TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 3, 2015: TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor