+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/9/2020
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 99, Nays 0, PNV 0
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/2/20
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 30
March 2, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 99
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor