+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/14/2022
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 3/7/2022
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 14, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 33
March 7, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor