+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- H. subst. & concurred in SJR 1011
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/8/2020
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/4/2020
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Committee for 6/3/2020
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/18/2020
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., ref. to Local Committee
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction