+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 4/15/2014
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- All added as Sponsors
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2014
- Reset on Regular cal. for 4/14/15
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2014
- Objected to on Consent Calendar.
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/03/14
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
April 14, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 96
+ − Sponsors (86)
Type:
Primary Sponsor