+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 4/8/2014
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/2/14
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
April 2, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor