+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/2/2020
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/24/20
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 2, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 31
February 24, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95