+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/15/2018
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- R/S Intro., adopted v.v.
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor