+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/16/2020
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 3/16/2020
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/12/2020
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 61, Nays 22, PNV 6
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/5/20
- Reset on cal. for 3/5/2020
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/27/20
- Objected to on Consent Calendar.
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/24/20
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 2
March 5, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor