+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Substituted for SJR 905
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 99, Nays 0, PNV 0
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/2/2020
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/27/2020
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 2/25/2020
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 99