+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/27/2020
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/20/20
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
February 20, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor