+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On August 17, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On August 14, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On August 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On August 14, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On August 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 8/12/2020
On August 12, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 2
On August 11, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 8/12/2020
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
August 12, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 2
August 12, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 30
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor