+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/1/2018
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 1
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/22/18
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 29
February 22, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor