+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 3/27/2014
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/20/14
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
March 27, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
March 20, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor