+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/10/2020
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 3
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1-30-20
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
February 10, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 29
January 30, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 86
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor