+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 3/20/2014
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- R/S Intro., adopted v.v.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 20, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 33