+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 2/12/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- All Ayes added as Sponsors
- Adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 2, PNV 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2-5-18
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
February 12, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
February 5, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
+ − Sponsors (78)
Type:
Primary Sponsor