+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 2/13/2017
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/6/17
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
February 13, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 33
February 6, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor