+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Substituted for SJR0536
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/12/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/8/2018
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/6/2018
- Intro., ref. to State Government Committee
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (4)
February 12, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
February 12, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
February 6, 2018: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 6, 2018: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor