+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Substituted for SJR0533
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/12/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/8/2018
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/6/2018
- Intro., ref. to State Government Committee
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.