+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- H. subst. & concurred in SJR 848
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/14/2022
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2022
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/2/2022
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., ref. to Education Administration
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 14, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93